House | 05/30/2015 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/29/2015 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/29/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 5216 | |
House | 05/29/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 5216 | |
House | 05/28/2015 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 05/27/2015 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 4953 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Filed |