House | 03/18/2015 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 03/05/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 559 | |
House | 03/05/2015 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 559 | |
House | 03/05/2015 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/02/2015 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 02/26/2015 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 463 | |
House | 02/19/2015 | Filed |