House | 05/21/2015 | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/19/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/19/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/19/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/19/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 3262 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3262 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3108 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1547 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1451 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1451 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1451 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1451 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1451 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1451 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1450 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1392 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 379 | |
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 379 | |
Senate | 03/06/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |