Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1022 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Uresti S.B. No. 1022
 (In the Senate - Filed March 6, 2015; March 11, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs; May 6, 2015,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 6, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1022 By:  Nelson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an unsworn declaration made by a private process server
 in the performance of the server's job duties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 132.001, Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended by amending Subsection (d) and adding Subsection
 (g) to read as follows:
 (d)  Except as provided by Subsections (e), [and] (f), and
 (g), an unsworn declaration made under this section must include a
 jurat in substantially the following form:
 "My name is __________ _________ ____________, my
 (First)     (Middle)     (Last)
 date  of birth is _________________, and my  address is
 _____________,  ____________,  _________,   _________,
 (Street)        (City)            (State)       (Zip Code)
 and __________________. I  declare  under  penalty  of
 (Country)
 perjury that the foregoing is true and correct.
 Executed in _______ County, State of ________, on
 the ________ day of ________, ________.
 (Month)   (Year)
 ____________________
 Declarant"
 (g)  An unsworn declaration made under this section by a
 private process server in the performance of the server's job
 duties must include a jurat in substantially the following form:
 "My name is ___________  __________  ___________,
 (First)       (Middle)        (Last)
 and I am a private process server with the following
 Judicial Branch Certification Commission
 identification number: __________________. I am
 executing this declaration as part of my assigned
 duties and responsibilities.  I declare under penalty
 of perjury that the foregoing is true and correct.
 Executed in _____________ County, State of
 _________, on the _____ day of ________, _______.
 (Month)    (Year)
 ____________________
 Declarant"
 SECTION 2.  Section 132.001(g), Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, as added by this Act, applies only to an unsworn declaration
 executed on or after the effective date of this Act. An unsworn
 declaration executed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect immediately before the effective date
 of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *