House | 05/22/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4217 | |
House | 05/20/2015 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 3544 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3544 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3546 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1625 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1596 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1596 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1596 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1596 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1596 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1595 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Amended | Journal Page: 1595 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Bettencourt | Journal Page: 1595 |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1595 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1595 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1542 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1392 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 381 | |
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 381 | |
Senate | 03/06/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |