E | 06/15/2015 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/15/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3646 | |
E | 05/25/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2163 | |
House | 05/24/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4467 | |
Senate | 05/24/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2004 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2026 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1898 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Record vote | RV#1313 | Journal Page: 4142 |
House | 05/22/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 4142 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4141 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3976 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3976 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/19/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3111 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 2445 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2445 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2139 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1303 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1209 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1209 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1209 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1209 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1209 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1209 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1209 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 817 | |
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 418 | |
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 418 | |
Senate | 03/09/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/09/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |