Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1115 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Campbell S.B. No. 1115
2- (White of Tyler)
1+S.B. No. 1115
32
43
5- A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
64 AN ACT
75 relating to a program allowing certain military voters on active
86 duty overseas to cast a ballot electronically.
97 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
108 SECTION 1. Sections 105.004(b), (c), (d), and (e), Election
119 Code, are amended to read as follows:
1210 (b) The secretary of state shall select to participate in
1311 the program a number of counties as determined by the secretary of
1412 state [one county] that:
1513 (1) desire [desires] to participate in the program;
1614 and
1715 (2) are [is] determined by the secretary of state to
1816 have the appropriate technological capabilities.
1917 (c) The secretary of state shall operate the program
2018 established under Subsection (a) as a pilot program until September
2119 1, 2017 [2015].
2220 (d) Not later than January 1, 2017 [2015], the secretary of
2321 state shall file a report with the legislature. The report may
2422 include the secretary of state's recommendations on the future use
2523 of e-mail ballot submission by members of the armed forces of the
2624 United States and suggestions for permanent statutory authority
2725 regarding e-mail ballot submission by members of the armed forces
2826 of the United States.
2927 (e) This section expires September 1, 2017 [2015].
3028 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
3129 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
3230 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
3331 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
3432 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
33+ ______________________________ ______________________________
34+ President of the Senate Speaker of the House
35+ I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1115 passed the Senate on
36+ April 30, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
37+ ______________________________
38+ Secretary of the Senate
39+ I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1115 passed the House on
40+ May 22, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 139, Nays 1,
41+ two present not voting.
42+ ______________________________
43+ Chief Clerk of the House
44+ Approved:
45+ ______________________________
46+ Date
47+ ______________________________
48+ Governor