E
|
06/17/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2015
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 3647
|
E
|
05/26/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2404
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4570
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2089
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2163
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1965
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1351
|
Journal Page: 4236
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4236
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4236
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4175
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4175
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3547
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 2445
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2445
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2139
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1303
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1209
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1209
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1209
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1209
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1209
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1209
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1209
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 952
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 436
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 436
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|