House | 05/29/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/25/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/25/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4774 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 2108 | |
House | 04/29/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2108 | |
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 654 | |
House | 03/25/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1029 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 639 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 581 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 581 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 581 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 581 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 581 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 581 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Amended | Journal Page: 581 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Rodrguez | Journal Page: 580 |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 580 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 580 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 451 | |
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/09/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/09/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 358 | |
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/25/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 02/25/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 02/25/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/25/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/27/2015 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 131 | |
Senate | 01/27/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 131 | |
Senate | 11/10/2014 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/10/2014 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |