House | 05/22/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4218 | |
House | 05/19/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/19/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/19/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/19/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/19/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/19/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 2264 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2264 | |
House | 04/17/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1706 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1002 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 946 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 946 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 946 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 946 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 946 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 946 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 945 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 951 | |
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 789 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 439 | |
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 439 | |
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |