Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1154 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill March 10, 2015

House Committee Report

Analysis February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 16, 2015

Senate Committee Report

Bill February 2, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2015
Bill April 13, 2015