E
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3648
|
E
|
05/30/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3592
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5692
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3503
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3439
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5210
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2732
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2732
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2732
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2726
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1965
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4354
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1389
|
Journal Page: 4354
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4354
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Amended
|
2-D. Miller
|
Journal Page: 4353
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4352
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4278
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Amended
|
7-D. Miller
|
Journal Page: 4278
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Motion to table fails
|
5-Bohac
|
Journal Page: 4277
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
5-Bohac
|
Journal Page: 4277
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
2-Villalba
|
Journal Page: 4267
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4267
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3845
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Referred to Business & Industry
|
|
Journal Page: 3262
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3262
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2808
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1437
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 1384
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1384
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1384
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1384
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1383
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1383
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1383
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Amended
|
FA1 West
|
Journal Page: 1383
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1383
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Postponed
|
|
Journal Page: 1366
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 West
|
Journal Page: 1355
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1354
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1354
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1001
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 440
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 440
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|