LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB1168
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB1168
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB1168
Compare Versions
SB1168 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1168 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1168 Enrolled May 29, 2015
SB1168 Comm Sub May 19, 2015
SB1168 Engrossed May 6, 2015
SB1168 Comm Sub April 20, 2015
SB1168 Introduced March 10, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB1168 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1168 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1168 Enrolled May 29, 2015
SB1168 Comm Sub May 19, 2015
SB1168 Engrossed May 6, 2015
SB1168 Comm Sub April 20, 2015
SB1168 Introduced March 10, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare