Senate | 04/20/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 999 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 758 | |
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 696 | |
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 440 | |
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 440 | |
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |