Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1172 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Nichols S.B. No. 1172
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2015; March 17, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 7, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 7, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1172 By:  Nichols


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of obligations payable from and secured by
 the Texas Mobility Fund.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 201.943(a) and (l), Transportation
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Subject to Subsections (e), (f), [and] (g), and (l), the
 commission by order or resolution may issue obligations in the name
 and on behalf of the state and the department and may enter into
 credit agreements related to the obligations. The obligations may
 be issued in multiple series and issues from time to time in an
 aggregate amount not exceeding the maximum obligation amount. The
 obligations may be issued on and may have the terms and provisions
 the commission determines appropriate and in the interests of the
 state. The obligations may be issued as long-term obligations,
 short-term obligations, or both. The latest scheduled maturity of
 an issue or series of obligations may not exceed 30 years.
 (l)  Except as otherwise provided by this subsection,
 obligations [Obligations] may not be issued under this section or
 Section 49-k, Article III, Texas Constitution, after January 1,
 2015 [if the commission or the department requires that toll roads
 be included in a regional mobility plan in order for a local
 authority to receive an allocation from the fund].  The commission
 may issue obligations to refund:
 (1)  outstanding obligations to provide savings to the
 state; and
 (2)  outstanding variable rate obligations and may
 renew or replace credit agreements relating to the obligations.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *