House | 05/18/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/15/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/15/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3787 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/13/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/13/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/13/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/13/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 2445 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2445 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2140 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1303 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1209 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1209 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1209 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1209 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1209 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1209 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1209 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 927 | |
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 442 | |
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 442 | |
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |