Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1205 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Rodríguez S.B. No. 1205
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2015; March 17, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 April 20, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 2; April 20, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1205 By:  West


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an environmental service fee charged by an institution
 of higher education.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 54.5041(h), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (h)  The fee may not be charged after the fifth academic year
 in which the fee is first charged unless:
 (1)  [, before the end of that academic year,] the
 institution has issued bonds payable in whole or in part from the
 fee, in which event the fee may not be charged after the academic
 year in which all such bonds, including refunding bonds for those
 bonds, have been fully paid; or
 (2)  the continuation of the fee is approved every five
 years by a majority vote of the students enrolled at the institution
 who participate in a general student election called for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *