E
|
06/16/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/16/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3647
|
E
|
05/26/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2404
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4570
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2089
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2163
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1970
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4116
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1293
|
Journal Page: 4115
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4115
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4115
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4098
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4098
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3787
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 2340
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2340
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1580
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 927
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 801
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 801
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 801
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 801
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 801
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 801
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 801
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 695
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 444
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 444
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|