E | 06/19/2015 | Effective on 9/1/15 | ||
E | 06/19/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3648 | |
E | 05/30/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3592 | |
House | 05/30/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5692 | |
Senate | 05/30/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3503 | |
Senate | 05/28/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3439 | |
Senate | 05/28/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2667 | |
House | 05/27/2015 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4818 | |
House | 05/27/2015 | Record vote | RV#1556 | Journal Page: 4818 |
House | 05/27/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 4818 | |
House | 05/27/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4818 | |
House | 05/27/2015 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4806 | |
House | 05/27/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4806 | |
House | 05/27/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/26/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3111 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Referred to Government Transparency & Operation | Journal Page: 2340 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2340 | |
House | 04/15/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1580 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 927 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 810 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 810 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 810 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 810 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 810 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 810 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Amended | Journal Page: 810 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Nichols | Journal Page: 810 |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 810 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 809 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 816 | |
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 709 | |
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 446 | |
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 446 | |
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |