House | 05/19/2015 | Record vote | RV#1218 | Journal Page: 3843 |
House | 05/19/2015 | Motion to suspend posting rule fails | Journal Page: 3843 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 3262 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3262 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2830 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1445 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1429 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1429 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1429 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1429 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1435 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1374 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1374 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1374 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Amended | Journal Page: 1374 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Hall | Journal Page: 1374 |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1373 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1373 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1391 | |
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1159 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1127 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Reported from s/c favorably with substitute | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Testimony taken in subcommittee | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Referred to s/c on Border Security by Pres | Journal Page: 448 | |
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 448 | |
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |