1 | | - | By: Hall S.B. No. 1252 |
---|
2 | | - | (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2015; March 17, 2015, read |
---|
3 | | - | first time and referred to Subcommittee on Border Security; |
---|
4 | | - | April 21, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee |
---|
5 | | - | Substitute to Committee on Veteran Affairs and Military |
---|
6 | | - | Installations; April 27, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
7 | | - | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 4, Nays 3; |
---|
8 | | - | April 27, 2015, sent to printer.) |
---|
9 | | - | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
10 | | - | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1252 By: Hall |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Hall, et al. S.B. No. 1252 |
---|
11 | 2 | | |
---|
12 | 3 | | |
---|
13 | 4 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
14 | 5 | | AN ACT |
---|
15 | 6 | | relating to an interstate compact on border security and |
---|
16 | 7 | | immigration enforcement. |
---|
17 | 8 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
18 | 9 | | SECTION 1. Title 7, Government Code, is amended by adding |
---|
19 | 10 | | Chapter 793 to read as follows: |
---|
20 | 11 | | CHAPTER 793. INTERSTATE COMPACT FOR BORDER SECURITY |
---|
21 | 12 | | Sec. 793.001. DEFINITION. In this chapter, "illegal alien" |
---|
22 | 13 | | means a person who: |
---|
23 | 14 | | (1) is not a citizen or national of the United States; |
---|
24 | 15 | | and |
---|
25 | 16 | | (2) is unlawfully present in the United States |
---|
26 | 17 | | according to the terms of 8 U.S.C. Section 1101 et seq. |
---|
27 | 18 | | Sec. 793.002. AUTHORITY TO EXECUTE INTERSTATE COMPACT. On |
---|
28 | 19 | | behalf of this state, the governor shall: |
---|
29 | 20 | | (1) coordinate, develop, and execute an interstate |
---|
35 | 23 | | for the compact. |
---|
36 | 24 | | Sec. 793.003. INTERSTATE COMPACT PROVISIONS. The compact |
---|
37 | 25 | | required by this chapter must provide for joint action among |
---|
38 | 26 | | compacting states on matters that include: |
---|
39 | 27 | | (1) the operational control of this state's border |
---|
40 | 28 | | with Mexico by the total detection and apprehension or deflection |
---|
41 | 29 | | of illegal aliens attempting to cross the border into this state; |
---|
42 | 30 | | and |
---|
43 | 31 | | (2) otherwise enforcing federal immigration laws, |
---|
44 | 32 | | including detecting, apprehending, detaining, prosecuting, |
---|
45 | 33 | | releasing, and monitoring of illegal aliens. |
---|
46 | 34 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
47 | 35 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
48 | 36 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
49 | 37 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
50 | 38 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|