House
|
05/11/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3111
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2548
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2548
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1706
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1002
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 949
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 949
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 949
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 949
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 949
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 949
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 949
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 951
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 925
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 789
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
Reported from s/c favorably with substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
Testimony taken in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 654
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Subcommittee meeting cancelled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations
|
|
Journal Page: 448
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 448
|
Senate
|
03/11/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|