Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1253 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Hall, et al. S.B. No. 1253
22 (Schaefer)
33
44
55 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
66 AN ACT
77 relating to a ribbon for certain members of the military forces who
88 served in support of operations to secure the Texas border.
99 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1010 SECTION 1. Section 437.355, Government Code, is reenacted
1111 to incorporate amendments made to Section 431.134, Government Code,
1212 by Chapter 243 (H.B. 402), Acts of the 83rd Legislature, Regular
1313 Session, 2013, and amended to read as follows:
1414 Sec. 437.355. OTHER AWARDS. (a) The governor or adjutant
1515 general, if delegated the authority, may adopt policies and
1616 regulations relating to awarding:
1717 (1) the Texas Purple Heart Medal, which shall be
1818 awarded to a service member who, after September 11, 2001:
1919 (A) was inducted into federal service from the
2020 Texas National Guard; and
2121 (B) meets the criteria for an award of the
2222 federal Purple Heart Medal;
2323 (2) the Texas Superior Service Medal, which shall be
2424 awarded to:
2525 (A) a service member of the Texas military forces
2626 who has:
2727 (i) completed 30 or more years of honorable
2828 state service or a combination of state and federal service; and
2929 (ii) continually demonstrated superior
3030 performance and service while assigned to key leadership positions
3131 demanding responsibility; or
3232 (B) a civilian who has contributed significant
3333 service to the Texas military forces;
3434 (3) the Lone Star Distinguished Service Medal, which
3535 shall be awarded to a member of the military forces of this state,
3636 another state, or the United States for exceptionally outstanding
3737 achievement or service to this state in performance of a duty of
3838 great responsibility while serving with the Texas military forces
3939 for whom the department receives a letter of recommendation for
4040 award of the Lone Star Distinguished Service Medal that:
4141 (A) gives an account of the exceptional
4242 achievement or service; and
4343 (B) includes facts and photographs, and extracts
4444 from official documents to support and amplify the facts;
4545 (4) the Texas Outstanding Service Medal, which shall
4646 be awarded to a service member of the military forces of this state,
4747 another state, or the United States who has performed service in a
4848 superior and clearly outstanding manner;
4949 (5) the Texas Humanitarian Service Medal, which shall
5050 be awarded to a service member who:
5151 (A) does not meet the criteria for an award of the
5252 federal Humanitarian Service Medal;
5353 (B) is a member of the Texas military forces; and
5454 (C) while serving on state active duty or active
5555 duty under state authority in accordance with Title 32, United
5656 States Code, participates satisfactorily in defense support to a
5757 mission under civilian authority to protect life or property during
5858 or soon after a natural disaster or civil unrest in the state;
5959 (6) the Texas Homeland Defense Service Medal, which
6060 shall be awarded to a service member of the Texas military forces
6161 who served:
6262 (A) on or after September 11, 2001;
6363 (B) on state active duty or active duty under
6464 state authority in accordance with Title 32, United States Code;
6565 and
6666 (C) satisfactorily in defense support to a
6767 mission in the state under civilian authority;
6868 (7) the Federal Service Medal, which shall be awarded
6969 to a service member who was inducted into federal service from the
7070 Texas military forces between June 15, 1940, and January 1, 1946, or
7171 after June 1, 1950, if the service was for more than 90 days;
7272 (8) the Texas Combat Service Ribbon, which shall be
7373 awarded to a service member of the Texas National Guard who served,
7474 after September 11, 2001, in a hostile fire zone as designated by
7575 the United States secretary of defense;
7676 (9) the Texas Faithful Service Medal, which shall be
7777 awarded to a member of the Texas military forces who has completed
7878 five years of honorable service during which the service member has
7979 shown fidelity to duty, efficient service, and great loyalty to
8080 this state;
8181 (10) the Texas Medal of Merit, which shall be awarded
8282 to a member of the military forces of this state, another state, or
8383 the United States who performs outstanding service or attains
8484 extraordinary achievement in behalf of the state or United States;
8585 (11) the Texas State Guard Service Medal, which shall
8686 be awarded to a service member who completes three consecutive
8787 years of honorable service in the Texas State Guard during which the
8888 service member has shown fidelity to duty, efficient service, and
8989 great loyalty to this state;
9090 (12) the Texas Desert Shield/Desert Storm Campaign
9191 Medal, which shall be awarded to a service member who was inducted
9292 into federal service from the Texas National Guard after August 1,
9393 1990, in support of Operation Desert Shield or Operation Desert
9494 Storm, without regard to the place that the service member was
9595 deployed while serving on active federal military duty;
9696 (13) the Texas Iraqi Campaign Medal, which shall be
9797 awarded to a service member who was inducted into federal service
9898 from the Texas National Guard, without regard to the place that the
9999 service member was deployed while serving on active federal
100100 military duty, after:
101101 (A) March 19, 2003, in support of Operation Iraqi
102102 Freedom; or
103103 (B) August 31, 2010, in support of Operation New
104104 Dawn; [and]
105105 (14) the Texas Afghanistan Campaign Medal, which shall
106106 be awarded to a service member who was inducted into federal service
107107 from the Texas National Guard after October 6, 2001, in support of
108108 Operation Enduring Freedom, without regard to the place that the
109109 service member was deployed while serving on active federal
110110 military duty;
111111 (15) the Cold War Medal, which shall be awarded to a
112112 member of the Texas National Guard or the Texas State Guard who
113113 served between September 2, 1945, and December 26, 1991, subject to
114114 Subsection (c); and
115115 (16) the Texas Border Security and Support Service
116116 Ribbon, which shall be awarded to a member of the Texas military
117117 forces who served:
118118 (A) on or after July 28, 2014;
119119 (B) on state active duty; and
120120 (C) satisfactorily in support of operations to
121121 secure the Texas border.
122122 (b) A person may be awarded only one Texas Superior Service
123123 Medal.
124124 (c) A person described by Subsection (a)(15) may be awarded
125125 a Cold War Medal only if a fee in the amount necessary to cover the
126126 costs of awarding the medal is paid to the adjutant general's
127127 department.
128128 SECTION 2. Section 431.134, Government Code, is repealed.
129129 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.