Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1253 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 04/16/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hall, et al. S.B. No. 1253


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a ribbon for certain members of the military forces who
 served in support of operations to secure the Texas border.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 437.355, Government Code, is reenacted
 to incorporate amendments made to Section 431.134, Government Code,
 by Chapter 243 (H.B. 402), Acts of the 83rd Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2013, and amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 437.355.  OTHER AWARDS. (a)  The governor or adjutant
 general, if delegated the authority, may adopt policies and
 regulations relating to awarding:
 (1)  the Texas Purple Heart Medal, which shall be
 awarded to a service member who, after September 11, 2001:
 (A)  was inducted into federal service from the
 Texas National Guard; and
 (B)  meets the criteria for an award of the
 federal Purple Heart Medal;
 (2)  the Texas Superior Service Medal, which shall be
 awarded to:
 (A)  a service member of the Texas military forces
 who has:
 (i)  completed 30 or more years of honorable
 state service or a combination of state and federal service; and
 (ii)  continually demonstrated superior
 performance and service while assigned to key leadership positions
 demanding responsibility; or
 (B)  a civilian who has contributed significant
 service to the Texas military forces;
 (3)  the Lone Star Distinguished Service Medal, which
 shall be awarded to a member of the military forces of this state,
 another state, or the United States for exceptionally outstanding
 achievement or service to this state in performance of a duty of
 great responsibility while serving with the Texas military forces
 for whom the department receives a letter of recommendation for
 award of the Lone Star Distinguished Service Medal that:
 (A)  gives an account of the exceptional
 achievement or service; and
 (B)  includes facts and photographs, and extracts
 from official documents to support and amplify the facts;
 (4)  the Texas Outstanding Service Medal, which shall
 be awarded to a service member of the military forces of this state,
 another state, or the United States who has performed service in a
 superior and clearly outstanding manner;
 (5)  the Texas Humanitarian Service Medal, which shall
 be awarded to a service member who:
 (A)  does not meet the criteria for an award of the
 federal Humanitarian Service Medal;
 (B)  is a member of the Texas military forces; and
 (C)  while serving on state active duty or active
 duty under state authority in accordance with Title 32, United
 States Code, participates satisfactorily in defense support to a
 mission under civilian authority to protect life or property during
 or soon after a natural disaster or civil unrest in the state;
 (6)  the Texas Homeland Defense Service Medal, which
 shall be awarded to a service member of the Texas military forces
 who served:
 (A)  on or after September 11, 2001;
 (B)  on state active duty or active duty under
 state authority in accordance with Title 32, United States Code;
 and
 (C)  satisfactorily in defense support to a
 mission in the state under civilian authority;
 (7)  the Federal Service Medal, which shall be awarded
 to a service member who was inducted into federal service from the
 Texas military forces between June 15, 1940, and January 1, 1946, or
 after June 1, 1950, if the service was for more than 90 days;
 (8)  the Texas Combat Service Ribbon, which shall be
 awarded to a service member of the Texas National Guard who served,
 after September 11, 2001, in a hostile fire zone as designated by
 the United States secretary of defense;
 (9)  the Texas Faithful Service Medal, which shall be
 awarded to a member of the Texas military forces who has completed
 five years of honorable service during which the service member has
 shown fidelity to duty, efficient service, and great loyalty to
 this state;
 (10)  the Texas Medal of Merit, which shall be awarded
 to a member of the military forces of this state, another state, or
 the United States who performs outstanding service or attains
 extraordinary achievement in behalf of the state or United States;
 (11)  the Texas State Guard Service Medal, which shall
 be awarded to a service member who completes three consecutive
 years of honorable service in the Texas State Guard during which the
 service member has shown fidelity to duty, efficient service, and
 great loyalty to this state;
 (12)  the Texas Desert Shield/Desert Storm Campaign
 Medal, which shall be awarded to a service member who was inducted
 into federal service from the Texas National Guard after August 1,
 1990, in support of Operation Desert Shield or Operation Desert
 Storm, without regard to the place that the service member was
 deployed while serving on active federal military duty;
 (13)  the Texas Iraqi Campaign Medal, which shall be
 awarded to a service member who was inducted into federal service
 from the Texas National Guard, without regard to the place that the
 service member was deployed while serving on active federal
 military duty, after:
 (A)  March 19, 2003, in support of Operation Iraqi
 Freedom; or
 (B)  August 31, 2010, in support of Operation New
 Dawn; [and]
 (14)  the Texas Afghanistan Campaign Medal, which shall
 be awarded to a service member who was inducted into federal service
 from the Texas National Guard after October 6, 2001, in support of
 Operation Enduring Freedom, without regard to the place that the
 service member was deployed while serving on active federal
 military duty;
 (15)  the Cold War Medal, which shall be awarded to a
 member of the Texas National Guard or the Texas State Guard who
 served between September 2, 1945, and December 26, 1991, subject to
 Subsection (c); and
 (16)  the Texas Border Security and Support Service
 Ribbon, which shall be awarded to a member of the Texas military
 forces who served:
 (A)  on or after July 28, 2014;
 (B)  on state active duty; and
 (C)  satisfactorily in support of operations to
 secure the Texas border.
 (b)  A person may be awarded only one Texas Superior Service
 Medal.
 (c)  A person described by Subsection (a)(15) may be awarded
 a Cold War Medal only if a fee in the amount necessary to cover the
 costs of awarding the medal is paid to the adjutant general's
 department.
 SECTION 2.  Section 431.134, Government Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.