Senate | 05/11/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1303 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/27/2015 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 132 | |
Senate | 01/27/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 132 | |
Senate | 11/10/2014 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/10/2014 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |