1 | 1 | | By: West S.B. No. 126 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Filed November 10, 2014; January 27, 2015, |
---|
3 | 3 | | read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice; |
---|
4 | 4 | | May 4, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee |
---|
5 | 5 | | Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 4, Nays 2; May 4, 2015, sent |
---|
6 | 6 | | to printer.) |
---|
7 | 7 | | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 126 By: Whitmire |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
11 | 11 | | AN ACT |
---|
12 | 12 | | relating to the release of certain inmates on medically recommended |
---|
13 | 13 | | intensive supervision. |
---|
14 | 14 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
15 | 15 | | SECTION 1. Sections 508.115(a) and (d), Government Code, |
---|
16 | 16 | | are amended to read as follows: |
---|
17 | 17 | | (a) Not later than the 11th day before the date a parole |
---|
18 | 18 | | panel orders the release of an inmate on parole or medically |
---|
19 | 19 | | recommended intensive supervision [of an inmate] or not later than |
---|
20 | 20 | | the 11th day after the date the board recommends that the governor |
---|
21 | 21 | | grant executive clemency, the division shall notify the sheriffs, |
---|
22 | 22 | | each chief of police, the prosecuting attorneys, and the district |
---|
23 | 23 | | judges in the county in which the inmate was convicted and the |
---|
24 | 24 | | county to which the inmate is released that a parole panel is |
---|
25 | 25 | | considering release on parole or medically recommended intensive |
---|
26 | 26 | | supervision or the governor is considering clemency. |
---|
27 | 27 | | (d) The notice must include [state]: |
---|
28 | 28 | | (1) the inmate's name; |
---|
29 | 29 | | (2) the county in which the inmate was convicted; |
---|
30 | 30 | | [and] |
---|
31 | 31 | | (3) the offense for which the inmate was convicted; |
---|
32 | 32 | | and |
---|
33 | 33 | | (4) to the extent permitted by federal law, |
---|
34 | 34 | | information relating to the inmate's physical or mental health |
---|
35 | 35 | | condition if the inmate is being considered for release on |
---|
36 | 36 | | medically recommended intensive supervision under Section 508.146. |
---|
37 | 37 | | SECTION 2. Section 508.146, Government Code, is amended by |
---|
38 | 38 | | amending Subsections (a) and (e) and adding Subsection (g) to read |
---|
39 | 39 | | as follows: |
---|
40 | 40 | | (a) An inmate other than an inmate who is serving a sentence |
---|
41 | 41 | | of death or life without parole may be released on medically |
---|
42 | 42 | | recommended intensive supervision on a date designated by a parole |
---|
43 | 43 | | panel described by Subsection (e), except that an inmate with an |
---|
44 | 44 | | instant offense that is an offense described in Section 3g, Article |
---|
45 | 45 | | 42.12, Code of Criminal Procedure, or an inmate who has a reportable |
---|
46 | 46 | | conviction or adjudication under Chapter 62, Code of Criminal |
---|
47 | 47 | | Procedure, may only be considered if a medical condition of |
---|
48 | 48 | | terminal illness or long-term care has been diagnosed by a |
---|
49 | 49 | | physician, if: |
---|
50 | 50 | | (1) the Texas Correctional Office on Offenders with |
---|
51 | 51 | | Medical or Mental Impairments, in cooperation with the Correctional |
---|
52 | 52 | | Managed Health Care Committee, identifies the inmate as [being]: |
---|
53 | 53 | | (A) [elderly, physically disabled, mentally ill, |
---|
54 | 54 | | terminally ill, or mentally retarded or having a condition] |
---|
55 | 55 | | requiring permanent long-term care, having a terminal illness, or |
---|
56 | 56 | | being a person with a severe and persistent mental illness or |
---|
57 | 57 | | intellectual and developmental disability, if the inmate is an |
---|
58 | 58 | | inmate with an instant offense that is described in Section 3g, |
---|
59 | 59 | | Article 42.12, Code of Criminal Procedure; or |
---|
60 | 60 | | (B) being in a persistent vegetative state or |
---|
61 | 61 | | being a person with an organic brain syndrome with significant to |
---|
62 | 62 | | total mobility impairment, if the inmate is an inmate who has a |
---|
63 | 63 | | reportable conviction or adjudication under Chapter 62, Code of |
---|
64 | 64 | | Criminal Procedure; |
---|
65 | 65 | | (2) the parole panel determines that, based on the |
---|
66 | 66 | | inmate's condition and a medical evaluation, the inmate does not |
---|
67 | 67 | | constitute a threat to public safety; and |
---|
68 | 68 | | (3) the Texas Correctional Office on Offenders with |
---|
69 | 69 | | Medical or Mental Impairments, in cooperation with the pardons and |
---|
70 | 70 | | paroles division, has prepared for the inmate a medically |
---|
71 | 71 | | recommended intensive supervision plan that requires the inmate to |
---|
72 | 72 | | submit to electronic monitoring, places the inmate on |
---|
73 | 73 | | super-intensive supervision, or otherwise ensures appropriate |
---|
74 | 74 | | supervision of the inmate. |
---|
75 | 75 | | (e) Only a parole panel [panels] composed of three [the |
---|
76 | 76 | | presiding officer of the board and two] members appointed to the |
---|
77 | 77 | | panel by the presiding officer may make determinations regarding |
---|
78 | 78 | | the release of inmates on medically recommended intensive |
---|
79 | 79 | | supervision under Subsection (a) or of inmates released pending |
---|
80 | 80 | | deportation. If the Texas Correctional Office [Council] on |
---|
81 | 81 | | Offenders with Medical or Mental Impairments identifies an inmate |
---|
82 | 82 | | as a candidate for release under the guidelines established by |
---|
83 | 83 | | Subsection (a)(1), the office [council] shall present to a parole |
---|
84 | 84 | | panel described by this subsection relevant information concerning |
---|
85 | 85 | | the inmate and the inmate's potential for release under this |
---|
86 | 86 | | section. |
---|
87 | 87 | | (g) For purposes of Subsection (a), "terminal illness" |
---|
88 | 88 | | means an incurable illness or condition that is expected to result |
---|
89 | 89 | | in death within one year regardless of life-sustaining treatment. |
---|
90 | 90 | | SECTION 3. (a) The Texas Department of Criminal Justice, |
---|
91 | 91 | | the Department of Aging and Disability Services, and the Health and |
---|
92 | 92 | | Human Services Commission jointly shall conduct a study regarding |
---|
93 | 93 | | the feasibility of contracting with a private entity to house |
---|
94 | 94 | | inmates released on medically recommended intensive supervision |
---|
95 | 95 | | under Section 508.146, Government Code, as amended by this Act, who |
---|
96 | 96 | | require skilled nursing services or 24-hour care. |
---|
97 | 97 | | (b) Not later than December 1, 2016, the Texas Department of |
---|
98 | 98 | | Criminal Justice shall report the results of the study conducted |
---|
99 | 99 | | under this section to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the |
---|
100 | 100 | | speaker of the house of representatives, and the standing |
---|
101 | 101 | | committees of the house of representatives and the senate with |
---|
102 | 102 | | primary jurisdiction over criminal justice matters. |
---|
103 | 103 | | (c) This section expires January 1, 2017. |
---|
104 | 104 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|
105 | 105 | | * * * * * |
---|