House
|
05/27/2015
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4806
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 4806
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Objections withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 4806
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4468
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Recommitted to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3859
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/20/15 8:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 3725
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3724
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/18/15 12:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 3066
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3066
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 3094
|
Journal Page: 3066
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3111
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Referred to Investments & Financial Services
|
|
Journal Page: 2109
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2109
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1944
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1127
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1065
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1065
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1065
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1065
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1065
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1065
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1065
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1001
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 483
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 483
|
Senate
|
03/11/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|