E
|
06/16/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/16/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3647
|
E
|
05/26/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2404
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4570
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2089
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2163
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1965
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1339
|
Journal Page: 4226
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4226
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4226
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4146
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
1-Larson
|
Journal Page: 4146
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4145
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/21/15 3:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 3975
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 3975
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Vote reconsidered
|
1-Larson
|
Journal Page: 3975
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3960
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3959
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1257
|
Journal Page: 3959
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Larson
|
Journal Page: 3958
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3958
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3787
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 2340
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2340
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1495
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 789
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 717
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 717
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 717
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 717
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 717
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 717
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 717
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 672
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 484
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 484
|
Senate
|
03/11/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|