Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1301 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Perry S.B. No. 1301
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2015; March 18, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Water, and
 Rural Affairs; April 1, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 1, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the governance and administration of the Texas Water
 Resources Finance Authority.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 20.012(a), Water Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  The authority is governed by a board of directors
 composed of the [six] directors of the development board.
 SECTION 2.  Section 20.015(b), Water Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  The board may hold special meetings at the call of the
 chairman or on request of a majority of the [three or more]
 directors.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *