House | 05/04/2015 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 2446 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2446 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2140 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1303 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1210 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1210 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1210 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1210 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1210 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1210 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1210 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 759 | |
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 487 | |
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 487 | |
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |