E | 06/10/2015 | Effective on 9/1/15 | ||
E | 06/10/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3646 | |
E | 05/22/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1946 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4214 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1897 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1946 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1806 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3928 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Record vote | RV#1247 | Journal Page: 3927 |
House | 05/21/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 3927 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3927 | |
House | 05/20/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3877 | |
House | 05/20/2015 | Record vote | RV#1232 | Journal Page: 3877 |
House | 05/20/2015 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3877 | |
House | 05/20/2015 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3875 | |
House | 05/20/2015 | Point of order overruled | Rule 8, Section 3 and Rule 11, Section 2 | Journal Page: 3874 |
House | 05/20/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3874 | |
House | 05/20/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/18/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3675 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/13/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/13/2015 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Referred to International Trade & Intergovernmental Affairs | Journal Page: 2549 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2549 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2450 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1340 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1284 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1284 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1284 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1283 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1283 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1283 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1300 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1201 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 492 | |
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 492 | |
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |