Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1454 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1454
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2015; March 19, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 22, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 1;
 April 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1454 By:  Lucio


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to authorizing counties to require the submission of
 digital maps in connection with the county plat approval process.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 232.001, Local Government Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (f) to read as follows:
 (f)  The commissioners court may require a plat application
 submitted for approval to include a digital map that is compatible
 with other mapping systems used by the county and that
 georeferences approved subdivision plats and related
 infrastructure. A digital map required under this subsection may
 be required only in a format widely used by common geographic
 information system software. A requirement adopted under this
 subsection must provide for an exemption from the requirement if
 the owner of the tract submits with the plat application an
 acknowledged statement indicating that the digital mapping
 technology necessary to submit a map that complies with this
 subsection was not reasonably accessible.
 SECTION 2.  Section 232.023, Local Government Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (f) to read as follows:
 (f)  The commissioners court may require a plat application
 submitted for approval to include a digital map that is compatible
 with other mapping systems used by the county and that
 georeferences approved subdivision plats and related
 infrastructure. A digital map required under this subsection may
 be required only in a format widely used by common geographic
 information system software. A requirement adopted under this
 subsection must provide for an exemption from the requirement if
 the subdivider of the tract submits with the plat application an
 acknowledged statement indicating that the digital mapping
 technology necessary to submit a map that complies with this
 subsection was not reasonably accessible.
 SECTION 3.  Section 232.072, Local Government Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  The commissioners court may require a plat application
 submitted for approval to include a digital map that is compatible
 with other mapping systems used by the county and that
 georeferences approved subdivision plats and related
 infrastructure. A digital map required under this subsection may
 be required only in a format widely used by common geographic
 information system software. A requirement adopted under this
 subsection must provide for an exemption from the requirement if
 the owner of the tract submits with the plat application an
 acknowledged statement indicating that the digital mapping
 technology necessary to submit a map that complies with this
 subsection was not reasonably accessible.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *