1 | 1 | | By: Lucio S.B. No. 1464 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2015; March 19, 2015, read |
---|
3 | 3 | | first time and referred to Subcommittee on Border Security; |
---|
4 | 4 | | April 14, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee |
---|
5 | 5 | | Substitute to Committee on Veteran Affairs and Military |
---|
6 | 6 | | Installations; April 20, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
7 | 7 | | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; |
---|
8 | 8 | | April 20, 2015, sent to printer.) |
---|
9 | 9 | | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
10 | 10 | | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1464 By: Lucio |
---|
11 | 11 | | |
---|
12 | 12 | | |
---|
13 | 13 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
14 | 14 | | AN ACT |
---|
15 | 15 | | relating to the creation of the transnational and organized crime |
---|
16 | 16 | | division within the office of the attorney general. |
---|
17 | 17 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
18 | 18 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 402, Government Code, is |
---|
19 | 19 | | amended by adding Section 402.038 to read as follows: |
---|
20 | 20 | | Sec. 402.038. TRANSNATIONAL AND ORGANIZED CRIME DIVISION. |
---|
21 | 21 | | (a) The office of the attorney general shall establish a |
---|
22 | 22 | | transnational and organized crime division. |
---|
23 | 23 | | (b) To address matters related to border security and |
---|
24 | 24 | | organized crime, the transnational and organized crime division |
---|
25 | 25 | | shall: |
---|
26 | 26 | | (1) establish within the division a prosecution unit |
---|
27 | 27 | | to provide critical assistance to local prosecutors; |
---|
28 | 28 | | (2) using existing funds, establish within the |
---|
29 | 29 | | division a trafficking of persons unit to: |
---|
30 | 30 | | (A) assist local law enforcement agencies and |
---|
31 | 31 | | local prosecutors in investigating and prosecuting trafficking of |
---|
32 | 32 | | persons and related crimes; and |
---|
33 | 33 | | (B) work with the appropriate local and state |
---|
34 | 34 | | agencies to identify victims of trafficking of persons and to |
---|
35 | 35 | | provide the types of assistance available for those victims under |
---|
36 | 36 | | Chapter 56, Code of Criminal Procedure; and |
---|
37 | 37 | | (3) develop initiatives to provide greater state |
---|
38 | 38 | | assistance, support, and coordination among state law enforcement |
---|
39 | 39 | | agencies, local law enforcement agencies, and local prosecutors. |
---|
40 | 40 | | (c) Assistance provided by the division under this section |
---|
41 | 41 | | may include the assistance authorized under Section 402.028. |
---|
42 | 42 | | SECTION 2. Not later than December 1, 2015, the office of |
---|
43 | 43 | | the attorney general shall establish the transnational and |
---|
44 | 44 | | organized crime division as required by Section 402.038, Government |
---|
45 | 45 | | Code, as added by this Act. |
---|
46 | 46 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|
47 | 47 | | * * * * * |
---|