Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1464 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Lucio S.B. No. 1464
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2015; March 19, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Subcommittee on Border Security;
 April 14, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute to Committee on Veteran Affairs and Military
 Installations; April 20, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0;
 April 20, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1464 By:  Lucio


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of the transnational and organized crime
 division within the office of the attorney general.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 402, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 402.038 to read as follows:
 Sec. 402.038.  TRANSNATIONAL AND ORGANIZED CRIME DIVISION.
 (a)  The office of the attorney general shall establish a
 transnational and organized crime division.
 (b)  To address matters related to border security and
 organized crime, the transnational and organized crime division
 shall:
 (1)  establish within the division a prosecution unit
 to provide critical assistance to local prosecutors;
 (2)  using existing funds, establish within the
 division a trafficking of persons unit to:
 (A)  assist local law enforcement agencies and
 local prosecutors in investigating and prosecuting trafficking of
 persons and related crimes; and
 (B)  work with the appropriate local and state
 agencies to identify victims of trafficking of persons and to
 provide the types of assistance available for those victims under
 Chapter 56, Code of Criminal Procedure; and
 (3)  develop initiatives to provide greater state
 assistance, support, and coordination among state law enforcement
 agencies, local law enforcement agencies, and local prosecutors.
 (c)  Assistance provided by the division under this section
 may include the assistance authorized under Section 402.028.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than December 1, 2015, the office of
 the attorney general shall establish the transnational and
 organized crime division as required by Section 402.038, Government
 Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *