Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1479 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Garcia S.B. No. 1479
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2015; March 19, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; May 5, 2015,
 reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 2;
 May 5, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to reasonable break times and facilities for school
 district educators expressing breast milk.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter I, Chapter 21, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 21.4051 to read as follows:
 Sec. 21.4051.  TIME AND FACILITIES FOR EXPRESSING BREAST
 MILK. A school district must:
 (1)  provide a reasonable amount of break time at
 appropriate intervals to accommodate an educator desiring to
 express breast milk for a child of the educator who is under one
 year of age; and
 (2)  provide a room or other location in close
 proximity to the educator's work area, other than a toilet stall or
 restroom, with an accessible electrical outlet and a locking door
 where the educator can express breast milk in private.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies beginning with the 2015-2016
 school year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *