Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1499 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Lucio S.B. No. 1499
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2015; March 19, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; May 19, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0;
 May 19, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1499 By:  Lucio


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to longevity pay for peace officers and firefighters in
 certain municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 141.032, Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 141.032.  LONGEVITY PAY. In a municipality with a
 population of 10,000 or more, each member of the fire or police
 department is entitled to receive, in addition to all other money
 paid for services rendered in the department, longevity pay of at
 least $4 a month for each year of service in the department[, not to
 exceed 25 years].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *