House
|
05/26/2015
|
Postponed
|
7/15/16 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 4754
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4754
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/26/15 3:06 PM
|
Journal Page: 4157
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4156
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/22/15 1:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 3879
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3879
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3675
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 3106
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3106
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2832
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1505
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1441
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1441
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1441
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1441
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1441
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1441
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1441
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1249
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 527
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 527
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|