E
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3648
|
E
|
05/30/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3592
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5692
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3504
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3439
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2669
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1556
|
Journal Page: 4817
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4817
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4817
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4792
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4792
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3405
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 2446
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2446
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2141
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1303
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1212
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1212
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1212
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1212
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1212
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1212
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1212
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1001
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 530
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 530
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|