Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1547 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/15/2015

                    By: Perry S.B. No. 1547
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2015; March 23, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 14, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 14, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to reducing certain fees for a license to carry a concealed
 handgun for county jailers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter H, Chapter 411, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 411.1953 to read as follows:
 Sec. 411.1953.  REDUCTION OF FEES FOR COUNTY JAILERS.
 Notwithstanding any other provision of this subchapter, an
 applicant who is a county jailer as defined by Section 1701.001,
 Occupations Code, shall pay a fee of $25 for the issuance of an
 original or renewed license under this subchapter.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a license issued or renewed on or after the effective date of
 this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *