Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1547 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill March 12, 2015

House Committee Report

Analysis February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 21, 2015

Senate Committee Report

Witness List February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill May 7, 2015
Bill April 15, 2015