1 | 1 | | By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1559 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
5 | 5 | | AN ACT |
---|
6 | 6 | | relating to an interagency plan to promote competitive and |
---|
7 | 7 | | integrated employment for persons with disabilities. |
---|
8 | 8 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 9 | | SECTION 1. Chapter 121, Human Resources Code, is amended by |
---|
10 | 10 | | adding Section 121.012 to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 11 | | Sec. 121.012. INTERAGENCY PLAN FOR COMPETITIVE AND |
---|
12 | 12 | | INTEGRATED EMPLOYMENT OF PERSONS WITH DISABILITIES. (a) The |
---|
13 | 13 | | comptroller, the Texas Education Agency, the Texas Workforce |
---|
14 | 14 | | Commission, and the Health and Human Services Commission, in |
---|
15 | 15 | | consultation with the Texas Council on Purchasing from People with |
---|
16 | 16 | | Disabilities, shall work together to develop and implement an |
---|
17 | 17 | | interagency plan designed to transition persons with disabilities |
---|
18 | 18 | | out of environments in which persons with disabilities are |
---|
19 | 19 | | segregated and receive wages that are less than minimum wage and |
---|
20 | 20 | | into environments in which persons with disabilities receive |
---|
21 | 21 | | competitive wages in integrated employment settings. |
---|
22 | 22 | | (b) Notwithstanding any other law, the plan established |
---|
23 | 23 | | under this section must: |
---|
24 | 24 | | (1) establish a timeline as follows: |
---|
25 | 25 | | (A) not later than September 1, 2016: |
---|
26 | 26 | | (i) the Texas Education Agency shall adopt |
---|
27 | 27 | | a plan to prohibit the future use of state funds for services |
---|
28 | 28 | | provided by a local education agency in a environments in which |
---|
29 | 29 | | persons with disabilities are segregated and receive wages that are |
---|
30 | 30 | | less than minimum wage; and |
---|
31 | 31 | | (ii) the Comptroller shall adopt a plan to |
---|
32 | 32 | | use revenue from the set-aside purchasing program administered by |
---|
33 | 33 | | the Texas Council on Purchasing from People with Disabilities to |
---|
34 | 34 | | convert environments in which persons with disabilities are |
---|
35 | 35 | | segregated and receive wages that are less than minimum wage to |
---|
36 | 36 | | individualized and community-based employment opportunities |
---|
37 | 37 | | offering at least minimum wage; |
---|
38 | 38 | | (B) not later than September 1, 2017: |
---|
39 | 39 | | (i) each state agency shall ensure that all |
---|
40 | 40 | | agency employees, including contract employees under set-aside |
---|
41 | 41 | | contracts for persons with disabilities, receive minimum wage; and |
---|
42 | 42 | | (ii) the comptroller shall develop and |
---|
43 | 43 | | implement policies that identify and remove barriers for state |
---|
44 | 44 | | agencies to hire and retain persons with disabilities in integrated |
---|
45 | 45 | | work environments at competitive wages; and |
---|
46 | 46 | | (C) not later than September 1, 2022, the Health |
---|
47 | 47 | | and Human Services Commission shall adopt a plan to prohibit the use |
---|
48 | 48 | | of state funds for programs offered in environments in which |
---|
49 | 49 | | persons with disabilities are segregated and receive wages that are |
---|
50 | 50 | | less than minimum wages; |
---|
51 | 51 | | (2) require the Department of Assistive and |
---|
52 | 52 | | Rehabilitative Services to conduct outreach to persons with |
---|
53 | 53 | | disabilities in sheltered workshops to determine the services, |
---|
54 | 54 | | reasonable accommodations, or assistive technology needed to |
---|
55 | 55 | | increase the marketable job skills, productivity, and work options |
---|
56 | 56 | | for persons with disabilities; |
---|
57 | 57 | | (3) require the Texas Education Agency to implement a |
---|
58 | 58 | | plan that promotes community-based work skills, supports, and |
---|
59 | 59 | | employment options to students with disabilities who are at least |
---|
60 | 60 | | 14 years of age; |
---|
61 | 61 | | (4) establish financial assistance and incentives for |
---|
62 | 62 | | employers that convert settings in which persons with disabilities |
---|
63 | 63 | | are segregated and receive wages that are less than minimum wage |
---|
64 | 64 | | into supported or integrated employment opportunities offering |
---|
65 | 65 | | competitive wages; and |
---|
66 | 66 | | (5) require state agencies participating in the |
---|
67 | 67 | | implementation of the plan to collect data in a manner that provides |
---|
68 | 68 | | information that is useful in determining how to sustain, expand, |
---|
69 | 69 | | and improve employment opportunities supported by the plan. |
---|
70 | 70 | | SECTION 2. Not later than January 1, 2016, the agencies |
---|
71 | 71 | | described by Section 121.012, Human Resources Code, as added by |
---|
72 | 72 | | this Act, shall develop the interagency plan required by that |
---|
73 | 73 | | section. |
---|
74 | 74 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote |
---|
75 | 75 | | of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided |
---|
76 | 76 | | by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does |
---|
77 | 77 | | not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes |
---|
78 | 78 | | effect September 1, 2015. |
---|