Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1559 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/12/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1559


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an interagency plan to promote competitive and
 integrated employment for persons with disabilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 121, Human Resources Code, is amended by
 adding Section 121.012 to read as follows:
 Sec. 121.012.  INTERAGENCY PLAN FOR COMPETITIVE AND
 INTEGRATED EMPLOYMENT OF PERSONS WITH DISABILITIES. (a)  The
 comptroller, the Texas Education Agency, the Texas Workforce
 Commission, and the Health and Human Services Commission, in
 consultation with the Texas Council on Purchasing from People with
 Disabilities, shall work together to develop and implement an
 interagency plan designed to transition persons with disabilities
 out of environments in which persons with disabilities are
 segregated and receive wages that are less than minimum wage and
 into environments in which persons with disabilities receive
 competitive wages in integrated employment settings.
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other law, the plan established
 under this section must:
 (1)  establish a timeline as follows:
 (A)  not later than September 1, 2016:
 (i)  the Texas Education Agency shall adopt
 a plan to prohibit the future use of state funds for services
 provided by a local education agency in a environments in which
 persons with disabilities are segregated and receive wages that are
 less than minimum wage; and
 (ii)  the Comptroller shall adopt a plan to
 use revenue from the set-aside purchasing program administered by
 the Texas Council on Purchasing from People with Disabilities to
 convert environments in which persons with disabilities are
 segregated and receive wages that are less than minimum wage to
 individualized and community-based employment opportunities
 offering at least minimum wage;
 (B)  not later than September 1, 2017:
 (i)  each state agency shall ensure that all
 agency employees, including contract employees under set-aside
 contracts for persons with disabilities, receive minimum wage; and
 (ii)  the comptroller shall develop and
 implement policies that identify and remove barriers for state
 agencies to hire and retain persons with disabilities in integrated
 work environments at competitive wages; and
 (C)  not later than September 1, 2022, the Health
 and Human Services Commission shall adopt a plan to prohibit the use
 of state funds for programs offered in environments in which
 persons with disabilities are segregated and receive wages that are
 less than minimum wages;
 (2)  require the Department of Assistive and
 Rehabilitative Services to conduct outreach to persons with
 disabilities in sheltered workshops to determine the services,
 reasonable accommodations, or assistive technology needed to
 increase the marketable job skills, productivity, and work options
 for persons with disabilities;
 (3)  require the Texas Education Agency to implement a
 plan that promotes community-based work skills, supports, and
 employment options to students with disabilities who are at least
 14 years of age;
 (4)  establish financial assistance and incentives for
 employers that convert settings in which persons with disabilities
 are segregated and receive wages that are less than minimum wage
 into supported or integrated employment opportunities offering
 competitive wages; and
 (5)  require state agencies participating in the
 implementation of the plan to collect data in a manner that provides
 information that is useful in determining how to sustain, expand,
 and improve employment opportunities supported by the plan.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than January 1, 2016, the agencies
 described by Section 121.012, Human Resources Code, as added by
 this Act, shall develop the interagency plan required by that
 section.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote
 of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided
 by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does
 not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes
 effect September 1, 2015.