Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1577 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 1577
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2015; March 23, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 23, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 1; April 23, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to access to criminal history record information by a
 county tax assessor-collector.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter F, Chapter 411, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 411.14065 to read as follows:
 Sec. 411.14065.  ACCESS TO CRIMINAL HISTORY RECORD
 INFORMATION:  COUNTY TAX ASSESSOR-COLLECTOR.  A county tax
 assessor-collector is entitled to obtain from the department
 criminal history record information maintained by the department
 that relates to a person who is an applicant for a motor vehicle
 title service license issued under Subchapter E, Chapter 520,
 Transportation Code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *