House | 05/14/2015 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 3543 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3543 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3108 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1547 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1490 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1490 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1490 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1489 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1489 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Amendment withdrawn | Journal Page: 1489 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | FA2 Garcia | Journal Page: 1489 |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1489 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Amended | Journal Page: 1489 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1488 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1488 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1501 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1340 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/27/2015 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 135 | |
Senate | 01/27/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 135 | |
Senate | 11/10/2014 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/10/2014 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |