Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB161 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Rodríguez S.B. No. 161
2- (In the Senate - Filed November 10, 2014; January 27, 2015,
3- read first time and referred to Committee on Education;
4- May 5, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
5- Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 5, 2015,
6- sent to printer.)
7-Click here to see the committee vote
8- COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 161 By: Rodríguez
2+ Garcia, West
93
104
115 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
126 AN ACT
137 relating to a study regarding the costs of educating students of
148 limited English proficiency in public schools.
159 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1610 SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 29, Education Code, is
1711 amended by adding Section 29.068 to read as follows:
1812 Sec. 29.068. STUDY REGARDING COSTS OF EDUCATING STUDENTS OF
1913 LIMITED ENGLISH PROFICIENCY; REPORT. (a) The agency shall conduct
2014 a study to examine the costs of educating a student of limited
2115 English proficiency in public schools. The study must:
2216 (1) determine whether the bilingual education
2317 allotment under Section 42.153 provides adequate funding to schools
2418 for meeting the educational needs of students of limited English
2519 proficiency;
2620 (2) if it is determined under Subdivision (1) that the
2721 bilingual education allotment is inadequate, determine the amount
2822 of adjustment for the bilingual education allotment that would
2923 provide adequate funding to schools for meeting the educational
30- needs of students of limited English proficiency; and
24+ needs of students of limited English proficiency;
3125 (3) determine whether the educational needs of
3226 students of limited English proficiency and the costs of meeting
3327 those needs vary by grade level from kindergarten through the 12th
34- grade.
28+ grade; and
29+ (4) identify measures that may lower costs and improve
30+ outcomes, including the following measures:
31+ (A) implementation of:
32+ (i) new technologies;
33+ (ii) new teaching mediums; and
34+ (iii) new teaching techniques; and
35+ (B) changes to the duration of the academic
36+ calendar and school day.
3537 (b) Not later than January 1, 2016, the agency shall prepare
3638 a report detailing the results of the study under this section and
3739 submit the report to each standing legislative committee with
3840 primary jurisdiction over primary and secondary education.
3941 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
4042 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
4143 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
4244 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
4345 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
44- * * * * *