E
|
06/18/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3647
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3644
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6045
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3626
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3643
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3619
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1799
|
Journal Page: 5846
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5846
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6024
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3593
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3529
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3394
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3394
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5520
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5520
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5209
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5209
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5209
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2817
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2817
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2817
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2817
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2813
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2408
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4671
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1507
|
Journal Page: 4671
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4671
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Amended
|
2-Wu
|
Journal Page: 4670
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4670
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4523
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1452
|
Journal Page: 4522
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4522
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Amended
|
5-Wu, Larson, Rose, J. White, Riddle, Leach, Simpson, Moody, Canales, Minjarez, and Sanford
|
Journal Page: 4520
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4517
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4343
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
|
|
Journal Page: 2341
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2341
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1581
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 927
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 805
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 805
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 805
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 805
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 804
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 804
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 804
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 696
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 538
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 538
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|