LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB1630
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB1630
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB1630
Compare Versions
SB1630 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1630 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1630 Enrolled June 1, 2015
SB1630 Comm Sub May 22, 2015
SB1630 Engrossed April 14, 2015
SB1630 Comm Sub April 7, 2015
SB1630 Introduced March 13, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB1630 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1630 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1630 Enrolled June 1, 2015
SB1630 Comm Sub May 22, 2015
SB1630 Engrossed April 14, 2015
SB1630 Comm Sub April 7, 2015
SB1630 Introduced March 13, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare