House
|
05/27/2015
|
Postponed
|
12/25/15 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 4793
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4793
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4104
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 4104
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3954
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3909
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 2446
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2446
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2266
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1303
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1234
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1234
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1234
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1234
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1234
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1234
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1234
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1125
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1093
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 539
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 539
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|