Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1641 Latest Draft

Bill / House Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: West, et al. S.B. No. 1641
 (Rose, Peña)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of a pilot program to provide
 protective services to certain persons determined to be at risk of
 future harm from abuse, neglect, or exploitation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter E, Chapter 48, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 48.212 to read as follows:
 Sec. 48.212.  PILOT PROGRAM TO PROVIDE PROTECTIVE SERVICES
 TO PERSONS AT RISK OF FUTURE HARM.  (a)  Notwithstanding any other
 law, including Section 48.002(a)(5), the department shall, using
 existing resources, develop and implement a pilot program that
 evaluates the feasibility and associated benefits of providing
 protective services when an elderly person or person with a
 disability has been determined, using criteria developed under
 Section 48.004, to be at risk of future harm from abuse, neglect, or
 exploitation, but who is not in a state of abuse, neglect, or
 exploitation.
 (b)  Section 48.1523 does not apply to reports considered
 under the pilot program developed under this section.
 (c)  The department may terminate the pilot program if the
 executive commissioner determines the termination is appropriate.
 The pilot program terminates August 31, 2017, unless the program is
 terminated before that date in accordance with this subsection.
 (d)  This section expires September 1, 2019.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than January 1, 2016, the Department of
 Family and Protective Services shall develop and implement the
 pilot program required under Section 48.212, Human Resources Code,
 as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  (a)  Not later than December 15, 2016, the
 Department of Family and Protective Services shall prepare and
 issue a report of preliminary findings from the pilot program
 required under Section 48.212, Human Resources Code, as added by
 this Act, to the governor, the lieutenant governor, and the
 standing legislative committees with primary jurisdiction over
 health and human services.
 (b)  Not later than December 15, 2017, the Department of
 Family and Protective Services shall submit a final report on the
 pilot program to the persons and entities described under
 Subsection (a) of this section.  The report must include:
 (1)  an evaluation of the feasibility and benefits of
 the pilot program;
 (2)  any additional findings the department determines
 appropriate; and
 (3)  recommendations for the continuation,
 elimination, or expansion of the pilot program.
 SECTION 4.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.