1 | 1 | | By: Watson S.B. No. 1658 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2015; March 23, 2015, read |
---|
3 | 3 | | first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental |
---|
4 | 4 | | Relations; May 12, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
5 | 5 | | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 2; |
---|
6 | 6 | | May 12, 2015, sent to printer.) |
---|
7 | 7 | | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
8 | 8 | | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1658 By: Lucio |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | |
---|
11 | 11 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
12 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
13 | 13 | | relating to a study and report on the establishment of a franchise |
---|
14 | 14 | | tax credit for the development of low income housing. |
---|
15 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
16 | 16 | | SECTION 1. (a) In this Act, "department" means the Texas |
---|
17 | 17 | | Department of Housing and Community Affairs. |
---|
18 | 18 | | (b) The department shall conduct a study to evaluate the |
---|
19 | 19 | | feasibility, methods, and costs of establishing a franchise tax |
---|
20 | 20 | | credit for the development of low income housing. |
---|
21 | 21 | | (c) In conducting the study, the department shall: |
---|
22 | 22 | | (1) evaluate and identify any sources of funding that |
---|
23 | 23 | | might be available to cover the probable cost of the credit; |
---|
24 | 24 | | (2) evaluate methods that have been implemented by |
---|
25 | 25 | | other states to provide a similar tax credit for the development of |
---|
26 | 26 | | low income housing and identify the method or methods that have |
---|
27 | 27 | | resulted in the greatest increase in the number of affordable |
---|
28 | 28 | | housing units; |
---|
29 | 29 | | (3) consider potential credit amounts and estimate: |
---|
30 | 30 | | (A) the number of affordable housing units that |
---|
31 | 31 | | would result from each credit amount; and |
---|
32 | 32 | | (B) the probable cost of each credit amount; |
---|
33 | 33 | | (4) estimate any tax savings to businesses that would |
---|
34 | 34 | | result if the credit could be sold or exchanged; and |
---|
35 | 35 | | (5) identify the state agency or agencies that could |
---|
36 | 36 | | most efficiently implement and administer the credit. |
---|
37 | 37 | | (d) The comptroller of public accounts shall assist the |
---|
38 | 38 | | department in conducting the study at the department's request. |
---|
39 | 39 | | (e) Not later than September 1, 2016, the department shall |
---|
40 | 40 | | submit to the legislature a written report on the results of the |
---|
41 | 41 | | study and any recommendations for legislative or other action. |
---|
42 | 42 | | (f) This Act expires September 1, 2017. |
---|
43 | 43 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
44 | 44 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
45 | 45 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
46 | 46 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
47 | 47 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|
48 | 48 | | * * * * * |
---|